ID H0297 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter Effective:
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 12, 2019 Session Law Chapter Effective:
2019-04-11HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 11, 2019
2019-04-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-11SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-04-11HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-04-11HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-04-11Senateto House
2019-04-11SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-11SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-0-7
2019-04-11SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-11SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-11SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2019-04-10SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-04-10Houseto Senate
2019-04-10HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-10HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 40-27-3
2019-04-09HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-08HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-05HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-04-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-04-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-04-01HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback