ID H0285 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 165 Effective: 04/05/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 165 Effective: 04/05/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides bonding authority in a principal amount to finance $162,000,000 of highway transportation projects and to provide intent language regarding the use of bond proceeds.
Title
Provides bonding authority in a principal amount to finance $162,000,000 of highway transportation projects and to provide intent language regarding the use of bond proceeds.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 165 Effective: 04/05/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 26-9-0 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Fin | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-21 | to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | Eskridge | |
2011-03-21 | 42-28-0 AYES -- Anderson, Barbieri, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Eskridge, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Moyle, Nesset, Nonini, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Rusche, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27) NAYS -- Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Boyle, Crane, Ellsworth, Gibbs(Wheeler), Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Lake, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Nielsen, Palmer, Raybould, Roberts, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(24), Thompson, Wood(35), Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-21 | PASSED | |
2011-03-21 | Rls susp | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-17 | to printing | |
2011-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-17 | House intro |