ID H0284 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $562,481,700 to the Idaho Transportation Department; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 1,827.50; expresses intent with regard to certain transfers being continuously appropriated; reappropriates certain balances for Contract Construction and Right-of-Way Acquisition; reappropriates certain balances for Airport Development Grants; authorizes the transfer of moneys to the Tourism and Promotion Fund; and exempts the appropriation from the provisions of Section 67-3511, Idaho Code.
Title
Appropriates $562,481,700 to the Idaho Transportation Department; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 1,827.50; expresses intent with regard to certain transfers being continuously appropriated; reappropriates certain balances for Contract Construction and Right-of-Way Acquisition; reappropriates certain balances for Airport Development Grants; authorizes the transfer of moneys to the Tourism and Promotion Fund; and exempts the appropriation from the provisions of Section 67-3511, Idaho Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Fin | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-21 | to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | Eskridge | |
2011-03-21 | 64-6-0 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Shepherd, Shirley, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, McGeachin, McMillan, Schaefer, Simpson Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-21 | PASSED | |
2011-03-21 | Rls susp | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-17 | to printing | |
2011-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-17 | House intro |