ID H0275 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2017 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR -- Appropriates $172,900 to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 3; and authorizes lump sum spending authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $172,900 to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 3; and authorizes lump sum spending authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2017 Session Law Chapter 208 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 27, 2017
2017-03-27HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-24SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-23HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-21Senateto House
2017-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2017-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2017-03-16SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-15Houseto Senate
2017-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-15HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2017-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-13HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-13HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback