ID H0274 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Returned from Governor vetoed on April 6, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Returned from Governor vetoed on April 6, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
INVASIVE SPECIES -- Amends and adds to existing law to establish the position of administrator of invasive species policy; to revise the duties of the director of the Idaho Department of Agriculture; to authorize the director to apply for search warrants under certain conditions, to provide that certain check stations may have extended operating hours; to provide penalties for any person failing to stop at a check station; to provide that the director shall pursue federal government partnerships and funding; to provide that the director under certain conditions shall enter into cooperative agreements; and to provide for formal memoranda of agreement with certain entities.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to establish the position of administrator of invasive species policy; to revise the duties of the director of the Idaho Department of Agriculture; to authorize the director to apply for search warrants under certain conditions, to provide that certain check stations may have extended operating hours; to provide penalties for any person failing to stop at a check station; to provide that the director shall pursue federal government partnerships and funding; to provide that the director under certain conditions shall enter into cooperative agreements; and to provide for formal memoranda of agreement with certain entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on April 6, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | to enrol |
2017-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-24 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-24 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |