ID H0269 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 232 Effective: 04/06/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 232 Effective: 04/06/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to dairies to provide that nutrient management plans and all information generated by dairies as a result of such plans shall be deemed to be trade secrets, production records or other proprietary information and shall be confidential and exempt from disclosure pursuant to specified law.
Title
Amends existing law relating to dairies to provide that nutrient management plans and all information generated by dairies as a result of such plans shall be deemed to be trade secrets, production records or other proprietary information and shall be confidential and exempt from disclosure pursuant to specified law.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 232 Effective: 04/06/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-2-2 | |
2011-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-21 | to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 61-7-2 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-14 | to printing | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | House intro |