ID H0265 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEXUAL EXHIBITIONS -- Adds to existing law to provide that certain persons and institutions must take reasonable steps to restrict the access of minors in certain instances, to provide for a civil action in certain instances, and to prohibit the use of public facilities and public assets for sexual exhibitions.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that certain persons and institutions must take reasonable steps to restrict the access of minors in certain instances, to provide for a civil action in certain instances, and to prohibit the use of public facilities and public assets for sexual exhibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |