ID H0264 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - H&W - MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES/ PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITALIZATION/SUBSTANCE ABUSE SERVICES - Appropriates $88,007,100 to the divisions of Mental Health, Psychiatric Hospitalization, and Substance Abuse Treatment and Prevention for fiscal year 2016; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for the three divisions to 673; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs expenditures for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; limits transfers of legislative appropriations; clarifies responsibility for education of certain children in state care; directs an interagency payment; provides for Court Services Fund transfers; and provides legislative intent relating to a Crisis Center location.
Title
Appropriates $88,007,100 to the divisions of Mental Health, Psychiatric Hospitalization, and Substance Abuse Treatment and Prevention for fiscal year 2016; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for the three divisions to 673; provides for General Fund transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs expenditures for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; limits transfers of legislative appropriations; clarifies responsibility for education of certain children in state care; directs an interagency payment; provides for Court Services Fund transfers; and provides legislative intent relating to a Crisis Center location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 212 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:58 a.m. on March 27, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-17 | House | PASSED -- 58-9-3 |
2015-03-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-13 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |