ID H0230 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 195 Effective: 05/01/2017 SECTION 1-6, 8, 9, 11; 12/01/2017 SECTION 7 & 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISH AND GAME -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the use of moneys for fishing access; to revise provisions regarding moneys paid into the Fish and Game Set-Aside Account; to provide for the use of moneys derived from certain license endorsements; to revise provisions regarding the transfer of certain amounts from the Expendable Big Game Depredation Fund; to revise conditions and requirements regarding payment for certain damages due to depredation; to revise certain deposit provisions regarding the Fish and Game Set-Aside Account; to provide for 3-year nonresident junior fishing licenses; to provide for license endorsements to fund wildlife depredation compensation and prevention and sportsmen access programs; to revise certain license fees; to revise provisions regarding procedures associated with depredation claims; and to provide that methods of determining forage utilization and damage or loss due to wildlife may include exclosure cages or other devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for the use of moneys for fishing access; to revise provisions regarding moneys paid into the Fish and Game Set-Aside Account; to provide for the use of moneys derived from certain license endorsements; to revise provisions regarding the transfer of certain amounts from the Expendable Big Game Depredation Fund; to revise conditions and requirements regarding payment for certain damages due to depredation; to revise certain deposit provisions regarding the Fish and Game Set-Aside Account; to provide for 3-year nonresident junior fishing licenses; to provide for license endorsements to fund wildlife depredation compensation and prevention and sportsmen access programs; to revise certain license fees; to revise provisions regarding procedures associated with depredation claims; and to provide that methods of determining forage utilization and damage or loss due to wildlife may include exclosure cages or other devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 195 Effective: 05/01/2017 SECTION 1-6, 8, 9, 11; 12/01/2017 SECTION 7 & 10
2017-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017
2017-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-17Senateto House
2017-03-17SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-17SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
2017-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-07Houseto Senate
2017-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-07HouseRules Suspended:
2017-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-06HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-02HouseReported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback