ID H0208 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 03/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 03/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- AGRICULTURE DEPARTMENT -- Appropriates an additional $1,019,900 to the Department of Agriculture for fiscal year 2017, of which $519,900 is for the methyl bromide project; and $500,000 is for animal tracking software; and provides reappropriation authority for fiscal year 2018.
Title
Appropriates an additional $1,019,900 to the Department of Agriculture for fiscal year 2017, of which $519,900 is for the methyl bromide project; and $500,000 is for animal tracking software; and provides reappropriation authority for fiscal year 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 85 Effective: 03/20/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-2-2 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-3-1 |
2017-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |