ID H0204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 147 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 147 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSONAL DELIVERY DEVICES -- Adds to and amends existing law to authorize personal delivery devices to operate on sidewalks of the state.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to authorize personal delivery devices to operate on sidewalks of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 147 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-3-2 |
2017-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |