ID H0204 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to postsecondary institutions and proprietary schools to revise provisions relating to registration and to provide for powers and duties of the director; to provide for civil penalties and to provide that a court may enter an order to recover costs; and to provide provisions relating to criminal penalties.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to postsecondary institutions and proprietary schools to revise provisions relating to registration and to provide for powers and duties of the director; to provide for civil penalties and to provide that a court may enter an order to recover costs; and to provide provisions relating to criminal penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 159 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2011-03-30 | To Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-25 | To enrol | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-14 | to Educ | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-11 | to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 54-13-3 | |
2011-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-01 | to Educ | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-28 | to printing | |
2011-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-28 | House intro |