ID H0203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 03/22/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 03/22/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates and transfers a total of $3,357,900 from the General Fund; transfers $3,080,400 to the Fire Suppression Deficiency Fund; transfers $209,000 to the Pest Control Deficiency Fund; and transfers $68,500 to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund.
Title
Appropriates and transfers a total of $3,357,900 from the General Fund; transfers $3,080,400 to the Fire Suppression Deficiency Fund; transfers $209,000 to the Pest Control Deficiency Fund; and transfers $68,500 to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 119 Effective: 03/22/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Delivered to Governor on 03/17 | |
2011-03-17 | To Governor | |
2011-03-16 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-14 | To enrol | |
2011-03-11 | to House | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-07 | to Fin | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2011-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-28 | to printing | |
2011-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-28 | House intro |