ID H0189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
BOND AND LEVY ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to establish the Government Noninterference in Bond and Levy Elections Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Government Noninterference in Bond and Levy Elections Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |