ID H0185 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXATION -- Amends existing law to increase the amount that may be deducted annually for contributions to a college savings program.
Title
Amends existing law to increase the amount that may be deducted annually for contributions to a college savings program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 84 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-5-2 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-15-1 |
2017-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |