ID H0158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATIONS -- Amends existing law to provide for certain prohibited conduct by homeowner's associations regarding solar panels, to provide that a homeowner's association may adopt certain rules, and to provide an exception.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for certain prohibited conduct by homeowner's associations regarding solar panels, to provide that a homeowner's association may adopt certain rules, and to provide an exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2019 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 19, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-04 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 55-13-2 |
2019-03-01 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2019-02-27 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Business |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |