ID H0156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION - PURCHASE OF PROPERTY - Amends existing law to provide that the county tax collector may bid on property for sale if it is deemed in the best interest of the county and to provide that the tax collector shall dispose of the purchased property by sale in the same manner as other personal property belonging to the county.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the county tax collector may bid on property for sale if it is deemed in the best interest of the county and to provide that the tax collector shall dispose of the purchased property by sale in the same manner as other personal property belonging to the county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-18 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-04 | House | PASSED -- 65-0-5 |
2015-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Local Government |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |