ID H0155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 13, 2021 Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 13, 2021 Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GOVERNMENT PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the transfer of property between government bodies.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the transfer of property between government bodies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 13, 2021 Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:27 a.m. on April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-04-07 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-05 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2021-03-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Local Government |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |