ID H0155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2019 Session Law Chapter 88 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2019 Session Law Chapter 88 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIQUOR LICENSES -- Amends existing law to provide for the boundaries of a year-round resort and to revise the definition of “year-round resort.”
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the boundaries of a year-round resort and to revise the definition of “year-round resort.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2019 Session Law Chapter 88 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-1-2 |
2019-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |