ID H0154 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2015 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ABORTION - Adds to existing law to provide requirements for chemical abortions and for administering certain drugs in abortions, to provide for a civil cause of action and conditions for anonymity of the female and to provide for construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide requirements for chemical abortions and for administering certain drugs in abortions, to provide for a civil cause of action and conditions for anonymity of the female and to provide for construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-06HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2015 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-04-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:23 a.m. on March 31, 2015
2015-03-31HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-30SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2015-03-30SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2015-03-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2015-03-26Houseto enrol
2015-03-26HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-26HouseLoertscher
2015-03-26House54-14-2 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Wintrow Absent -- Vander Woude, Wood Floor Sponsor
2015-03-26HousePASSED
2015-03-26HouseRules Suspended: Ayes 63 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 7, read three times
2015-03-26HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2015-03-25HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-25HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2015-03-24HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2015-03-24HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2015-03-24HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2015-03-23Senateto House
2015-03-23SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-23SenatePASSED -- 27-7-1
2015-03-23SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate
2015-03-20SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2015-03-19SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2015-03-19SenateAmendments reported printed
2015-03-19SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2015-03-19SenateAmendments ordered printed
2015-03-19SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2015-03-17SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2015-03-03SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-03-02Houseto Senate
2015-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2015-03-02HousePASSED -- 55-14-1
2015-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2015
2015-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2015-02-26HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 2, 2015
2015-02-25HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-02-24HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-02-19HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback