ID H0151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 181 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 181 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission to remove reference to the Department of Agriculture and to provide that the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission shall be established in the department of self-governing agencies; to revise provisions relating to the nomination of grower members of the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission; to provide for nomination at a meeting of the Idaho Alfalfa and Clover Seed Growers Association, to provide for submission of names to the Governor; and to remove an exception relating to vacancies in commission offices.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission to remove reference to the Department of Agriculture and to provide that the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission shall be established in the department of self-governing agencies; to revise provisions relating to the nomination of grower members of the Alfalfa and Clover Seed Commission; to provide for nomination at a meeting of the Idaho Alfalfa and Clover Seed Growers Association, to provide for submission of names to the Governor; and to remove an exception relating to vacancies in commission offices.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 181 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-07 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2011-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-14 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-11 | to printing | |
2011-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-11 | House intro |