ID H0146 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2017 Session Law Chapter 260 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE -- Amends existing law to provide that a victim of sexual assault shall not be denied a certain medical examination, to provide that inability to pay for an examination shall not be an obstacle, to revise provisions regarding retention of sexual assault evidence kits, to provide that certain persons shall receive written notification in certain instances and to provide that law enforcement shall notify certain persons regarding a change in the status of a case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide that a victim of sexual assault shall not be denied a certain medical examination, to provide that inability to pay for an examination shall not be an obstacle, to revise provisions regarding retention of sexual assault evidence kits, to provide that certain persons shall receive written notification in certain instances and to provide that law enforcement shall notify certain persons regarding a change in the status of a case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 6, 2017 Session Law Chapter 260 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:20 a.m. on March 24, 2017
2017-03-24HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-23SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-23SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-20Senateto House
2017-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Webb
2017-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2017-02-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-02-27Houseto Senate
2017-02-27HouseTitle apvd
2017-02-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-02-24HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017
2017-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback