ID H0145 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/04/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “employer.”
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “employer.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/04/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | to enrol |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-24 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-22 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-22 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2017-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2017-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |