ID H0143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - U.C. to be referred to Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - U.C. to be referred to Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and adds to existing law relating to invasive species to provide for protection against invasive species permits and stickers, to provide that failure to display stickers in designated manners shall be unlawful, to specify fee provisions, to provide for violations and penalties and to provide for enforcement.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law relating to invasive species to provide for protection against invasive species permits and stickers, to provide that failure to display stickers in designated manners shall be unlawful, to specify fee provisions, to provide for violations and penalties and to provide for enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | U.C. to be referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/H0143.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/H0143.pdf |