ID H0140 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MEDICAL CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT -- Adds to existing law to prohibit discrimination against certain persons on the basis of their vaccination status and to prohibit state contracts with companies that engage in such discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to prohibit discrimination against certain persons on the basis of their vaccination status and to prohibit state contracts with companies that engage in such discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2021-02-24SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-02-23Houseto Senate
2021-02-23HouseTitle apvd
2021-02-23HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 49-21-0
2021-02-23HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2021-02-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-02-18HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback