ID H0139 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Returned from Governor vetoed on April 6, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BARBER AND COSMETOLOGY SERVICES -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish licensing and other provisions for occupations providing barber and cosmetology services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to establish licensing and other provisions for occupations providing barber and cosmetology services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on April 6, 2017
2017-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017
2017-03-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-28SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-24HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-23Senateto House
2017-03-23SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-23SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 29-6-0
2017-03-23SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2017-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-02-28Houseto Senate
2017-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2017-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-11-1
2017-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-24HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017
2017-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-22HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback