ID H0138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FORCIBLE ENTRY AND UNLAWFUL DETAINER -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions and procedures regarding an action for forcible entry and unlawful detainer.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions and procedures regarding an action for forcible entry and unlawful detainer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 34-36-0 |
2019-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |