ID H0133 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 39 Nays 29 Abs/Excd 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 39 Nays 29 Abs/Excd 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to allow private parental driver's education.
Title
Amends existing law to allow private parental driver's education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 39 Nays 29 Abs/Excd 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:25 p.m. on March 15, 2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-12-0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-02-16 | House | to Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Title apvd |
2023-02-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-8-1 |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |