ID H0131 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to provide that the Idaho Transportation Department may refuse to issue a dealer or salesman license to any applicant convicted of any felony committed in conjunction with a dealership and to provide that licensed motor vehicle dealers and salesmen convicted of certain offenses shall not be eligible to reapply for a license until certain conditions are met.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the Idaho Transportation Department may refuse to issue a dealer or salesman license to any applicant convicted of any felony committed in conjunction with a dealership and to provide that licensed motor vehicle dealers and salesmen convicted of certain offenses shall not be eligible to reapply for a license until certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 234 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 a.m. on March 24, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-4-3 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-02 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-28 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2017-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |