ID H0128 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 03/23/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 03/23/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEALERS AND SALESMEN LICENSING -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding termination, cancellation, and renewal of franchise agreements and related protests, hearings, and costs.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding termination, cancellation, and renewal of franchise agreements and related protests, hearings, and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2023 Session Law Chapter 122 Effective: 03/23/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:20 p.m. on March 20, 2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-8-2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-3-3 |
2023-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |