ID H0127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2021 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 03/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2021 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 03/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BROADBAND -- Adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Broadband Fund and the Idaho Broadband Advisory Board.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Idaho Broadband Fund and the Idaho Broadband Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2021 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 03/23/2021 |
2021-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:40 p.m. on March 19, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-15 | Senate | PASSED 25-10-0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2021-03-01 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 40-27-3 |
2021-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |