ID H0121 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2013 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Credit Rating Enhancement Committee to revise provisions relating to meetings of the committee; to revise powers and duties of the committee and to provide that the committee shall report to the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate by August 1 of each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Credit Rating Enhancement Committee to revise provisions relating to meetings of the committee; to revise powers and duties of the committee and to provide that the committee shall report to the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate by August 1 of each year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-02HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2013 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/13
2013-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on March 27, 2013
2013-03-27HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-27SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2013-03-27SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2013-03-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2013-03-26HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2013-03-25Senateto House
2013-03-25SenateTitle apvd
2013-03-25SenatePASSED -- 35-0-0
2013-03-25SenateRead third time in full
2013-03-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-03-18SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2013-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2013-02-26Houseto Senate
2013-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2013-02-26HousePASSED -- 66-2-2
2013-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full
2013-02-25HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2013-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2013-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2013-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2013-02-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback