ID H0120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MORTICIANS AND FUNERAL HOME DIRECTORS -- Adds to existing law to authorize the Board of Morticians to issue inactive licenses to morticians and funeral home directors and to promulgate rules governing the inactive licenses.
Title
Adds to existing law to authorize the Board of Morticians to issue inactive licenses to morticians and funeral home directors and to promulgate rules governing the inactive licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1 |
2017-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |