ID H0119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REAL ESTATE APPRAISER BOARD -- Authorizes the Idaho Real Estate Board to collect and remit fees necessary to provide appraisal management services in connection with federally related transactions from an appraisal management company to the appropriate federal agency.
Title
Authorizes the Idaho Real Estate Board to collect and remit fees necessary to provide appraisal management services in connection with federally related transactions from an appraisal management company to the appropriate federal agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 18-17-0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-27-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |