ID H0118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2019 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements and restrictions for pretrial risk assessment tools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide certain requirements and restrictions for pretrial risk assessment tools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2019 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 28, 2019
2019-03-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-27SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-27SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-26HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-25Houseto enrol
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 60-0-10
2019-03-22HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-21HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-21HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-03-20HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-03-20HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration for concurrence recommendation
2019-03-19HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-15SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-14SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-14SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-14SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-14SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-14SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-11SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-04Houseto Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-04HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 66-2-2
2019-03-01HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-28HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2019-02-28HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2019-02-27HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2019-02-27HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2019-02-27HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2019-02-27HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2019-02-11HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback