ID H0095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE LOTTERY -- Amends existing law to provide that the state lottery shall not disclose certain identifying information of prize winners, to provide criteria for written authorization by a prize winner to disclose identifying information, to provide an exception to certain state agencies and vendors; and to provide that certain identifying information and records of prize winners shall be exempt from disclosure.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the state lottery shall not disclose certain identifying information of prize winners, to provide criteria for written authorization by a prize winner to disclose identifying information, to provide an exception to certain state agencies and vendors; and to provide that certain identifying information and records of prize winners shall be exempt from disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-9-0 |
2017-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |