ID H0088 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HIGHWAY DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNT -- Amends existing law to revise apportionment provisions regarding the Highway Distribution Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise apportionment provisions regarding the Highway Distribution Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2019-03-12SenateRet’d to House
2019-03-12SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- FAILED 17-18-0
2019-03-08SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-03-07SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-07SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-03-07SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-03-07SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-03-05SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-02-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-02-18Houseto Senate
2019-02-18HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-18HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-14-0
2019-02-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 18, 2019
2019-02-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-06HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback