ID H0088 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAY DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNT -- Amends existing law to revise apportionment provisions regarding the Highway Distribution Account.
Title
Amends existing law to revise apportionment provisions regarding the Highway Distribution Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- FAILED 17-18-0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-14-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |