ID H0085 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-22 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DAYLIGHT SAVING TIME -- Adds to existing law to provide that the State of Idaho shall be exempt from the daylight saving time provisions of federal law.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that the State of Idaho shall be exempt from the daylight saving time provisions of federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 15-55-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |