ID H0085 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE PERSONNEL SYSTEM -- Amends existing law to provide that certain physicians employed by the Department of Health and Welfare are nonclassified employees.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain physicians employed by the Department of Health and Welfare are nonclassified employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-02-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 28-38-4 |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |