ID H0085 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to determining a vacancy on the Highway District Board, to establish provisions relating to filling a vacancy and to establish qualifications and other provisions relating to a person selected to fill a vacancy.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to determining a vacancy on the Highway District Board, to establish provisions relating to filling a vacancy and to establish qualifications and other provisions relating to a person selected to fill a vacancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2013 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-02-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:44 a.m. on February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-02-15 | Senate | to House |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-02-15 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-07 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |