ID H0068 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 3, 2021 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 03/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 3, 2021 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 03/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHER EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to provide for policies regarding the prevention and spread of infectious disease at colleges and universities.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for policies regarding the prevention and spread of infectious disease at colleges and universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 3, 2021 Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 03/03/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-01 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-11 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-11 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |