ID H0063 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 79 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 79 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to veterinarians to provide that certain violations constituting a breach of the North American Veterinary Licensing Examination shall constitute grounds for specified discipline.
Title
Amends existing law relating to veterinarians to provide that certain violations constituting a breach of the North American Veterinary Licensing Examination shall constitute grounds for specified discipline.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 79 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-15 | Delivered to Governor on 03/14 | |
2011-03-14 | To Governor | |
2011-03-11 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-09 | To enrol | |
2011-03-08 | to House | |
2011-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-16 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-16 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-15 | to Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-09 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-09 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-28 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-01-28 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-27 | to printing | |
2011-01-27 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-27 | House intro |