ID H0060 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to make technical corrections in the election consolidation law enacted in 2009.
Title
Amends existing law to make technical corrections in the election consolidation law enacted in 2009.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 11 Effective: 01/01/11 | |
2011-02-23 | Delivered to Governor on 02/22 | |
2011-02-22 | To Governor | |
2011-02-21 | Pres signed | |
2011-02-18 | Sp signed | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-02-17 | To enrol | |
2011-02-16 | to House | |
2011-02-16 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-02-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-04 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-04 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-04 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-03 | to Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-03 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2011-02-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-01 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-27 | to St Aff | |
2011-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-26 | to printing | |
2011-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-26 | House intro |