ID H0045 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DIETITIANS -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise licensing and other provisions relating to the practice of dietetics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise licensing and other provisions relating to the practice of dietetics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06HouseU.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
2017-02-03HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 6, 2017
2017-02-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-01-24HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback