ID H0038 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to organic food products to delete a certificate issuance restriction relating to education requirements.
Title
Amends existing law relating to organic food products to delete a certificate issuance restriction relating to education requirements.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 50 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to Governor on 03/09 | |
2011-03-09 | To Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-04 | To enrol | |
2011-03-03 | to House | |
2011-03-03 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-21 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-21 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-18 | to Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 57-0-13 | |
2011-02-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-11 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-11 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-11 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-26 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-25 | to printing | |
2011-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-25 | House intro |