ID H0029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 03/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 03/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEXUAL OFFENDER CLASSIFICATION BOARD -- Amends existing law to provide that voting records of the former Sexual Offender Classification Board shall be exempt from disclosure and to authorize the Sexual Offender Management Board to manage and maintain the records of the former Sexual Offender Classification Board.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that voting records of the former Sexual Offender Classification Board shall be exempt from disclosure and to authorize the Sexual Offender Management Board to manage and maintain the records of the former Sexual Offender Classification Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2021 Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 03/12/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2021-01-28 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |