ID H0028 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JUVENILE CORRECTIONS ACT -- Amends existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise a definition, and to define terms regarding juvenile corrections.
Title
Amends existing law to revise legislative intent, to revise a definition, and to define terms regarding juvenile corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-0-4 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2021-01-28 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |