ID H0026 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JUVENILE CORRECTIONS ACT -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding the apprehension, release, and detention of juveniles and to remove reference to habitual status offenders.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to revise provisions regarding the apprehension, release, and detention of juveniles and to remove reference to habitual status offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 8, 2021 Session Law Chapter 19 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-0-4 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-01-28 | House | to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | Title apvd |
2021-01-28 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |