ID H0026 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to fees to increase a certain fee to be deposited in the Peace Officers Standards and Training Fund.
Title
Amends existing law relating to fees to increase a certain fee to be deposited in the Peace Officers Standards and Training Fund.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2011-02-01 | 3rd rdg -- FAILED -- 31-35-4 | |
2011-01-28 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-01-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-01-27 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-01-27 | rec d/p | |
2011-01-27 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-21 | to Jud | |
2011-01-21 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-20 | to printing | |
2011-01-20 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-20 | House intro |